NC H647 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Enhanced In-Service Retirement for LEOs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhanced In-Service Retirement for LEOs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-12SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-12SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-05-12HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-11HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-11HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-10HousePlaced On Cal For 05/11/2021
2021-05-10HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-10HouseReptd Fav
2021-05-04HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-04HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-04-26HouseRef to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-26HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-22HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
128(n/a)Citation Text
12821(n/a)Citation Text
12824(n/a)Citation Text
1358(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback