NC H56 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Ch. SL 2017-209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Ch. SL 2017-209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Environmental Laws
Title
Amend Environmental Laws
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia McElraft [R] | Rep. Lawrence Yarborough [R] | Rep. Larry Pittman [R] | Rep. Michele Presnell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-10-04 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-10-04 - House - Veto Override (Y: 70 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 61 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-08-30 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt Conference Report (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 102 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - A1 Yarborough Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-10-04 - House - Veto Override (Y: 70 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 61 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-08-30 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt Conference Report (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 102 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - A1 Yarborough Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-04 | Ch. SL 2017-209 | |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Veto Overridden |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Veto Received from House |
2017-10-04 | House | Veto Overridden |
2017-10-04 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-09-21 | House | Received from the Governor |
2017-09-21 | Vetoed 09/21/2017 | |
2017-08-31 | Pres. To Gov. 8/31/2017 | |
2017-08-31 | Ratified | |
2017-08-31 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-08-31 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2017-08-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/31/2017 |
2017-08-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d) |
2017-08-30 | House | Reptd Fav For Adoption |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2017-08-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-08-30 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2017-08-30 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-08-30 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2017-06-29 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2017-06-28 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-28 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2017 |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-25 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-04-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-24 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-04-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-20 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-20 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-02-08 | House | Ref To Com On Environment |
2017-02-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed |