NC H485 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-20 - Ch. Res 2009-10
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-20 - Ch. Res 2009-10
Summary
State Bd. of Community College Elections.
Title
State Bd. of Community College Elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Alice Bordsen [D] | Rep. Lorene Coates [D] | Rep. Jimmy Love [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] |
Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-20 | Ch. Res 2009-10 | |
2009-04-20 | Ratified | |
2009-04-16 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-04-15 | Placed On Cal For 4/16/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-15 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-04-14 | Ref To Com On Education | |
2009-04-14 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-04-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-08 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-04-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-25 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2009-03-25 | Rec From House | |
2009-03-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-23 | Placed On Cal For 3/24/2009 | |
2009-03-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-03-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-17 | Assigned To Education Subcommittee on Community Colleges | |
2009-03-16 | Re-ref Com On Education | |
2009-03-16 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-03-09 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-03-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-05 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H485 |