NC H472 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Ch. SL 2020-26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Ch. SL 2020-26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
NCSU/NC A&T Matching Funds/Umstead Act
Title
NCSU/NC A&T Matching Funds/Umstead Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | Ch. SL 2020-26 | |
2020-06-19 | Signed by Gov. 6/19/2020 | |
2020-06-12 | Pres. To Gov. 6/12/2020 | |
2020-06-11 | Ratified | |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2020-06-04 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2020-06-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/04/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-06-03 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-06-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-03 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-06-02 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-02 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-06-02 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations, Education Stricken |
2019-03-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - Universities, if favorable, Appropriations, Education, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S640 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate