NC H465 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-07 - Re-ref Com On Agriculture
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-07 - Re-ref Com On Agriculture
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
REPS Credits at Cleanfields Parks
Title
REPS Credits at Cleanfields Parks
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Bell [D] | Rep. William Brisson [R] | Rep. Kenneth Goodman [D] | Rep. James Langdon [R] |
Rep. Stephen LaRoque [R] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Darrell McCormick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Re-ref Com On Agriculture | |
2011-04-07 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-03-28 | Ref To Com On Public Utilities | |
2011-03-28 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S484 (Same As) 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-279