PA HB1956 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 24, 2018 (P.L.719, No.112), known as the Patient Test Result Information Act, further providing for definitions, for test results and for duties of Department of Health.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for test results and for duties of Department of Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1956 PN 2722, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03429 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03408 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1956 PN 2722, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03429 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03408 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2024-03-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2024-03-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2024-03-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-03-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-03-20 | House | Second consideration |
2024-03-18 | House | Removed from table |
2024-03-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-03-18 | House | First consideration |
2024-03-18 | House | Reported as amended |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to HEALTH |