LA HB122 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to discussion of sexual orientation and gender identity in public schools
Title
Provides relative to discussion of sexual orientation and gender identity in public schools
Sponsors
Rep. Dodie Horton [R] | Rep. Beryl Amedee [R] | Rep. Raymond Crews [R] | Rep. Kathy Edmonston [R] |
Rep. Danny McCormick [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 122 FINAL PASSAGE (#526) (Y: 69 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 122 AMENDMENT # 2986 BY FREIBERG MOTION TO ADOPT (#525) (Y: 30 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 122 AMENDMENT # 2803 BY FREIBERG MOTION TO ADOPT (#524) (Y: 28 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 122 AMENDMENT # 2986 BY FREIBERG MOTION TO ADOPT (#525) (Y: 30 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 122 AMENDMENT # 2803 BY FREIBERG MOTION TO ADOPT (#524) (Y: 28 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 69, nays 28. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/2024. |
2024-04-11 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported favorably (9-3). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-02-23 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2024. |
2024-02-22 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-02-22 | House | Prefiled. |