US HB8369 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 120-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To provide for the expeditious delivery of defense articles and defense services for Israel and other matters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Israel Security Assistance Support Act

Sponsors

Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. Erin Houchin [R-IN]Rep. Rudolph Yakym III [R-IN]Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA]
Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY]Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX]Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL]Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY]
Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI]Rep. Jake Ellzey [R-TX]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]
Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV]Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA]Rep. Jennifer Kiggans [R-VA]Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]
Rep. Ryan Zinke [R-MT]Rep. David Valadao [R-CA]Rep. John Carter [R-TX]Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR]
Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX]Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO]Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]
Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT]Rep. Ernest Gonzales [R-TX]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]
Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN]Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA]Rep. Nicholas Langworthy [R-NY]Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL]
Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Harriet Hageman [R-WY]Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]
Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS]Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO]Rep. Mike Garcia [R-CA]Rep. Thomas Kean [R-NJ]
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY]Rep. Nathaniel Moran [R-TX]
Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL]Rep. John Rose [R-TN]Rep. Nick LaLota [R-NY]Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS]
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX]Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS]Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA]
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA]Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA]
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL]Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX]Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK]Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]
Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]Rep. Wesley Hunt [R-TX]Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK]Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA]
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]Rep. Brandon Williams [R-NY]Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY]Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC]
Rep. Julia Letlow [R-LA]Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA]
Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN]Rep. Russell Fry [R-SC]Rep. John James [R-MI]Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE]
Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX]Rep. Jacob Laturner [R-KS]Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI]Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX]
Rep. Ronny Jackson [R-TX]Rep. French Hill [R-AR]Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL]Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD]
Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV]Rep. Juan Ciscomani [R-AZ]Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX]Rep. Elizabeth Van Duyne [R-TX]
Rep. Harold Rogers [R-KY]Rep. Chuck Edwards [R-NC]Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA]Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA]
Rep. John Joyce [R-PA]Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC]Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX]
Rep. Zachary Nunn [R-IA]Rep. Mark Green [R-TN]Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA]Rep. Cory Mills [R-FL]
Rep. John Duarte [R-CA]Rep. Brad Finstad [R-MN]Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI]Rep. Kevin Kiley [R-CA]
Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO]Rep. Lori Chavez-DeRemer [R-OR]Rep. Randy Feenstra [R-IA]Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]
Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]Rep. Anthony D'Esposito [R-NY]Rep. Scott Franklin [R-FL]
Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN]Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY]Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA]Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]

Roll Calls

2024-05-16 - House - On Passage RC# 217 (Y: 224 N: 187 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - House - On Motion to Recommit RC# 216 (Y: 202 N: 210 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-21SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
2024-05-20SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
2024-05-16HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2024-05-16HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 224 - 187 (Roll no. 217).
2024-05-16HouseOn motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 202 - 210 (Roll no. 216).
2024-05-16HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3310-3311)
2024-05-16HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 8369, the Chair put the question on the motion to recommit and by voice vote announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Meeks demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
2024-05-16HouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX.
2024-05-16HouseMr. Meeks moved to recommit to the Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2024-05-16HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2024-05-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 8369.
2024-05-16HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 8369, H.R. 7530, H.R. 7343, H.R. 8146, H.R. 7581, H.R. 354, H. Res. 1213 and H. Res. 1210. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 8369, H.R. 7530, H.R. 7581, H.R. 354, H. Res. 1213, and H. Res. 1210 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate each. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 7343 and H.R. 8146 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate each. Rule provides for one motion to recommit each on H.R. 8369, H.R. 7530, H.R. 7343, H.R. 7581, H.R. 354, and H.R. 8146.
2024-05-16HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1227. (consideration: CR H3287-3294)
2024-05-15HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1227 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 8369, H.R. 7530, H.R. 7343, H.R. 8146, H.R. 7581, H.R. 354, H. Res. 1213 and H. Res. 1210. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 8369, H.R. 7530, H.R. 7581, H.R. 354, H. Res. 1213, and H. Res. 1210 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate each. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 7343 and H.R. 8146 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate each. Rule provides for one motion to recommit each on H.R. 8369, H.R. 7530, H.R. 7343, H.R. 7581, H.R. 354, and H.R. 8146.
2024-05-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2024-05-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR1227 (Related) 2024-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback