NC H433 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Nuisance Abatement Changes
Title
Nuisance Abatement Changes
Sponsors
Rep. Alice Bordsen [D] | Sen. William Cook [R] | Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Francis Iler [R] |
Rep. Dan Ingle [R] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Frank McGuirt [D] | Rep. Rodney Moore [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-06-09 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-24 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2011-03-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-22 | Filed |