NC H370 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-13)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Responsible Firefighting Foam Management Act
Title
Responsible Firefighting Foam Management Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Davis [R] | Rep. Jason Saine [R] | Rep. Kyle Hall [R] | Rep. Mike Clampitt [R] |
Rep. Vernetta Alston [D] | Rep. Mary Belk [D] | Rep. Brian Biggs [R] | Rep. Gloristine Brown [D] |
Rep. Maria Cervania [D] | Rep. Rosa Gill [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Chris Humphrey [R] |
Rep. Neal Jackson [R] | Rep. Ray Jeffers [D] | Rep. Joe John [D] | Rep. Jake Johnson [R] |
Rep. Donnie Loftis [R] | Rep. Carolyn Logan [D] | Rep. Tim Longest [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] |
Rep. Nasif Majeed [D] | Rep. Charles Miller [R] | Rep. Ben Moss [R] | Rep. Howard Penny [R] |
Rep. Ray Pickett [R] | Rep. Reece Pyrtle [R] | Rep. Bill Ward [R] | Rep. Harry Warren [R] |
Rep. Diane Wheatley [R] | Rep. Donna White [R] | Rep. David Willis [R] | Rep. Matthew Winslow [R] |
Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-04-27 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-04-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-04-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-16 | House | Ref to the Com on Environment, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-16 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Definitions
Emergency Equipment
Emergency Services
Environment
Environmental Health
Firefighters & Firefighting
Hazardous Substances
Public
Public Health
Safety
Work Safety
Emergency Equipment
Emergency Services
Environment
Environmental Health
Firefighters & Firefighting
Hazardous Substances
Public
Public Health
Safety
Work Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
143 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
143 | 215.104FF | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | 215.104GG | (n/a) | Citation Text |