NC H360 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Ch. SL 2021-55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize Dan River State Trail

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize Dan River State Trail

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25 Ch. SL 2021-55
2021-06-25 Signed by Gov. 6/25/2021
2021-06-24 Pres. To Gov. 6/24/2021
2021-06-23 Ratified
2021-06-22SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-06-22SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-06-22SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-06-21SenateReptd Fav
2021-06-15SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-15SenateReptd Fav
2021-05-20SenateRe-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-04-26SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-26SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-26SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-04-23HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-04-22HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-04-22HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-04-22HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-04-22HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-04-22HouseReptd Fav
2021-04-21HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-21HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-24HouseRef to the Com on State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-24HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-23HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
143B135.54(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H360
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H360v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H360v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H360v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H360v3.pdf
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H360-SMBW-25(e1)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H360-SMBW-28(e1)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H360-SMBR-50(e1)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H360-SMBR-51(e1)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/137
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/300

Bill Comments 750

feedback