NC H360 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Ch. SL 2011-132
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Ch. SL 2011-132
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Columbia Municipal Early Voting
Title
Columbia Municipal Early Voting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Ch. SL 2011-132 | |
2011-06-15 | Ratified | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-04-05 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2011-04-05 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-05 | Rec From House | |
2011-04-04 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-31 | Placed On Cal For 4/4/2011 | |
2011-03-31 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-03-31 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-16 | Ref To Com On Government | |
2011-03-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Filed |