NC H345 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-28 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-28 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Northampton Shooting Ranges
Title
Northampton Shooting Ranges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-28 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2016 |
2016-06-23 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2016-06-23 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-02 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-26 | House | Ref To Com On Local Government |
2015-03-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-24 | House | Filed |