NC H324 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-13 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-13 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring Dignity & Nondiscrimination/Schools
Title
Ensuring Dignity & Nondiscrimination/Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-01 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 61 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 66 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 66 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-13 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-09-10 | House | Received from the Governor |
2021-09-10 | Vetoed 09/10/2021 | |
2021-09-03 | Pres. To Gov. 9/3/2021 | |
2021-09-03 | Ratified | |
2021-09-01 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-09-01 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2021-08-31 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/01/2021 |
2021-08-31 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2021-08-30 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-08-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-08-24 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-08-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2021-05-12 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-12 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/12/2021 |
2021-05-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2021-05-10 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-10 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-24 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/25/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-03-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/24/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-03-23 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-18 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-17 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Charter Schools
Colleges & Universities
Curriculum
Dhhs
Disasters & Emergencies
Discrimination
Diseases & Health Disorders
Distance Education
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Higher Education
Internet
Kindergarten
Lgbtq & Gender Issues
Local Government
Minorities
Presented
Private Schools
Public
Public Health
Public Health Emergency
Public Instruction Dept.
Ratified
Religion & Religious Institutions
Reporting
Secondary Education
Telecommunications
Teleservices
Title Change
Unc
Vetoed
Charter Schools
Colleges & Universities
Curriculum
Dhhs
Disasters & Emergencies
Discrimination
Diseases & Health Disorders
Distance Education
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Higher Education
Internet
Kindergarten
Lgbtq & Gender Issues
Local Government
Minorities
Presented
Private Schools
Public
Public Health
Public Health Emergency
Public Instruction Dept.
Ratified
Religion & Religious Institutions
Reporting
Secondary Education
Telecommunications
Teleservices
Title Change
Unc
Vetoed
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | 218.85 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 238.66 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 81.61 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | 239.8 | (n/a) | Citation Text |