NC H307 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
NC Time Zone/Observe DST All Year
Title
NC Time Zone/Observe DST All Year
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 99 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-04-23 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-04-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-04-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-21 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-13 | House | Re-ref Com On State Government |
2021-04-13 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-16 | House | Ref to the Com on Federal Relations and American Indian Affairs, if favorable, State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-16 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S39 (Same As) 2021-02-02 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
81A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
81A | 100 | (n/a) | Citation Text |