NC H276 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-23 - Ch. SL 2015-168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-23 - Ch. SL 2015-168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Agency Participation Procedures Act of 2015
Title
Agency Participation Procedures Act of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-21 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-07-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - A1 Bradford Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-07-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - A1 Bradford Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-23 | Ch. SL 2015-168 | |
2015-07-23 | Signed by Gov. 7/23/2015 | |
2015-07-23 | Pres. To Gov. 7/23/2015 | |
2015-07-22 | Ratified | |
2015-07-21 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-07-21 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2015-07-21 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-07-21 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2015-07-20 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-07-20 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-22 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-21 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement |
2015-03-25 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-19 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Pensions and Retirement |
2015-03-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-18 | House | Filed |