NC H273 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Charter Schools in State Health Plan
Title
Charter Schools in State Health Plan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2018-06-07 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-06-07 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-07 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/07/2018 |
2018-06-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-06 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2017-03-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-08 | House | Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Appropriations |
2017-03-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |