NC H27 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Ch. SL 2023-1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Ch. SL 2023-1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Elect Thomasville City Bd. of Ed
Title
Elect Thomasville City Bd. of Ed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Ch. SL 2023-1 | |
2023-03-09 | Ratified | |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-02-16 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-02-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 02/15/2023 |
2023-02-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-02-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-02-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-02-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-01-31 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-01-31 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Appointments
Boards
Chaptered
Charters
Counties
Davidson County
Education
Education Boards
Elections
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Membership
Municipalities
Ratified
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Thomasville
Boards
Chaptered
Charters
Counties
Davidson County
Education
Education Boards
Elections
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Membership
Municipalities
Ratified
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Thomasville
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | 37 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
163 | 279 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
163 | 292 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
163 | 294.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text |