NC H241 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-18 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-18 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Uniformed Civil Service Act
Title
Uniformed Civil Service Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2023-04-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-02 | House | Ref to the Com on Military and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S589 (Same As) 2023-04-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Appropriations
Armed Forces
Budgeting
Discrimination
Employment
Labor Dept.
Leave
Personnel
Public
Salaries & Benefits
Armed Forces
Budgeting
Discrimination
Employment
Labor Dept.
Leave
Personnel
Public
Salaries & Benefits
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
143B | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
143B | 1033 | (n/a) | Citation Text |