NC H224 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - Ch. SL 2013-30
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - Ch. SL 2013-30
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Asheville ETJ and Annexation
Title
Asheville ETJ and Annexation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 76 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - A2 Fisher Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 76 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - A1 Ramsey Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 76 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - A2 Fisher Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 76 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - A1 Ramsey Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | Ch. SL 2013-30 | |
2013-04-17 | Ratified | |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Amend Failed A1 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/16/2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-03 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-03 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2013-04-03 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-04-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/03/2013 |
2013-04-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2013-03-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-03-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-06 | House | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance |
2013-03-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Filed |