NC H170 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Ch. SL 2019-103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Ch. SL 2019-103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Various Satellite Annexations
Title
Various Satellite Annexations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-09 - House - M11 Concur R3 Ruled Mat'l (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - House - M11 Concur R2 Ruled Mat'l (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - House - M11 Concur R2 Ruled Mat'l (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Ch. SL 2019-103 | |
2019-07-10 | Ratified | |
2019-07-09 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-07-09 | House | Concurred On 3rd Reading |
2019-07-08 | House | Concurred On 2nd Reading |
2019-07-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/08/2019 |
2019-07-04 | House | Ruled Material |
2019-07-04 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2019-07-02 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/01/2019 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-05 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/03/2019 |
2019-04-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-03-13 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-02-26 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |