NC H170 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-28 - Ref To Com On Insurance
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-28 - Ref To Com On Insurance
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Dept. of Insurance/Public Health Service Act
Title
Dept. of Insurance/Public Health Service Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Insurance |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-03-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-03-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-03-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/27/2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-03-26 | House | Serial Referral To Judiciary Subcommittee A Stricken |
2013-03-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-02-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Judiciary Subcommittee A |
2013-02-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S481 (Same As) 2013-03-28 - Ref To Com On Insurance