NC H169 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State Health Plan Data Transparency.-AB
Title
State Health Plan Data Transparency.-AB
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-20 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-16 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Health |
2021-04-13 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement |
2021-03-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-24 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added |
2021-03-24 | House | Serial Referral To Health Added |
2021-03-24 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2021-03-01 | House | Ref to the Com on State Government, if favorable, Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S174 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Confidentiality
Health
Insurance
Privacy
Public
Records
Salaries & Benefits
State Employees
State Health Plan
Teachers
Health
Insurance
Privacy
Public
Records
Salaries & Benefits
State Employees
State Health Plan
Teachers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
135 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
135 | 48.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | 48.32 | (n/a) | Citation Text |