NC H158 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Ch. SL 2015-21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Ch. SL 2015-21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Jim Fulghum Teen Skin Cancer Prevention Act
Title
Jim Fulghum Teen Skin Cancer Prevention Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Ch. SL 2015-21 | |
2015-05-21 | Signed by Gov. 5/21/2015 | |
2015-05-15 | Pres. To Gov. 5/15/2015 | |
2015-05-14 | Ratified | |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Health Care |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-22 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-21 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Regulatory Reform |
2015-03-16 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-03-12 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-03-12 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-05 | House | Ref To Com On Health |
2015-03-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S125 (Same As) 2015-03-11 - Re-ref Com On Health Care