NC H156 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Ch. SL 2021-13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Ch. SL 2021-13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Unclaimed Prop. Div. Amend./DMV Tech Chngs-AB
Title
Unclaimed Prop. Div. Amend./DMV Tech Chngs-AB
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Ch. SL 2021-13 | |
2021-04-27 | Signed by Gov. 4/27/2021 | |
2021-04-21 | Pres. To Gov. 4/21/2021 | |
2021-04-20 | Ratified | |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Transportation |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2021-03-30 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-03-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-30 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-03-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-03-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2021-03-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-02-25 | House | Ref to the Com on State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Chaptered
Council Of State
Disasters & Emergencies
Dmv
Escheats
Executive Orders
Governor
Motor Vehicles
Presented
Property
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Session Laws
State Treasurer
Title Change
Transportation Dept.
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Chaptered
Council Of State
Disasters & Emergencies
Dmv
Escheats
Executive Orders
Governor
Motor Vehicles
Presented
Property
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Session Laws
State Treasurer
Title Change
Transportation Dept.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
116B | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
116B | 65 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116B | 67 | (n/a) | Citation Text |