NC H155 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Unclaimed Property Changes.-AB
Title
Unclaimed Property Changes.-AB
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-13 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-02-27 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-27 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-02-25 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-21 | House | Filed |