NC H151 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Failed 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Failed 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Req Active Time Felony Death MV/Boat
Title
Req Active Time Felony Death MV/Boat
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Pittman [R] | Rep. Carson Smith [R] | Sen. Bobby Hanig [R] | Rep. Keith Kidwell [R] |
Rep. James Boles [R] | Rep. Edward Goodwin [R] | Rep. Charles Graham [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Failed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/10/2021 |
2021-05-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary 2 |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-02-25 | House | Ref to the Com on Marine Resources and Aqua Culture, if favorable, Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S213 (Same As) 2021-03-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Boats & Watercraft
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Death & Dying
Homicide
Motor Vehicles
Public
Sentencing
Traffic Offenses
Transportation
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Death & Dying
Homicide
Motor Vehicles
Public
Sentencing
Traffic Offenses
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
20 | 141.4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
75A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
75A | 10.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text |