NC H1191 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-29 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
Pending: House Judiciary I Committee
Status: Introduced on April 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-29 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
Pending: House Judiciary I Committee
Summary
Property Finders.
Title
Property Finders.
Sponsors
Rep. John Blust [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-04-29 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-08 | Ref to the Com on State Government/State Personnel, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-04-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-07 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1021 (Same As) 2009-07-17 - Ch. SL 2009-312
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1191 |