NC H1093 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Agricultural Regulatory Reform
Title
Agricultural Regulatory Reform
Sponsors
Rep. Glen Bradley [R] | Sen. William Cook [R] | Rep. James Dixon [R] | Rep. Jonathan Jordan [R] |
Rep. Frank McGuirt [D] | Rep. Larry Pittman [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - House - A1 Bradley\Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - House - A1 Bradley\Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2012-06-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-12 | Rec From House | |
2012-06-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-11 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/11/2012 | |
2012-06-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-05-24 | Ref To Com On Agriculture | |
2012-05-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-23 | Filed |