NC H102 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Ch. SL 2015-26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Ch. SL 2015-26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Utility Vehicles/Move-Over Changes
Title
Utility Vehicles/Move-Over Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - A1 Davis Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - A1 Davis Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Ch. SL 2015-26 | |
2015-05-21 | Signed by Gov. 5/21/2015 | |
2015-05-15 | Pres. To Gov. 5/15/2015 | |
2015-05-14 | Ratified | |
2015-05-13 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-05-13 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2015-05-13 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-05-13 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2015-05-12 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-05-11 | Engrossed | |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/11/2015 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Transportation |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-03-17 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-03-16 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-03-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/16/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-03-11 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-03-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/11/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-03-10 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-02-27 | House | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2015-02-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-02-23 | House | Filed |