MT SJ30 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study resolution relating to state government issues
Title
Interim study resolution relating to state government issues
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Thomas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee |
2017-04-12 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2017-04-07 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2017-04-06 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-04-06 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2017-04-05 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-04-05 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-04-05 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-04-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-04-05 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-04-05 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-04-05 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-04-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-04-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-04-05 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-04-04 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-04-01 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-03-23 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Communications
Environmental Protection
Legislature, Interim Studies
Property
Public Officers and Employees
State Government
Transportation
Environmental Protection
Legislature, Interim Studies
Property
Public Officers and Employees
State Government
Transportation
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=30&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SJ&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20171 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2017/senjoint/SJ0030_1.pdf |