MT SB515 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - (S) Missed Deadline for Referendum Proposal Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - (S) Missed Deadline for Referendum Proposal Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional referendum on redistricting
Title
Constitutional referendum on redistricting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for Referendum Proposal Transmittal |
2023-03-24 | Senate | (S) Bill Not Heard at Sponsor's Request (S) State Administration |
2023-03-20 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-03-18 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-03-18 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2023-03-17 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-03-16 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-03-16 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-03-16 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-03-16 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-03-15 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-03-15 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-03-15 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-03-15 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-03-15 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-03-14 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-03-13 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-03-13 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-03-13 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-03-13 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2023-01-28 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-01-14 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2022-12-04 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2022-11-30 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=515&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20231 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2023/SB0599/SB0515_1.pdf |