MT SB394 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise intangible personal property exemption and unit valuation methodology
Title
Revise intangible personal property exemption and unit valuation methodology
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Taxation |
2015-04-14 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Taxation |
2015-04-09 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-30 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-30 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-03-28 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-26 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2015-03-25 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-03-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2015-03-18 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-03-18 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2015-03-10 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2015-03-10 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-03-10 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-03-10 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-03-09 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-03-09 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-03-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-03-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-03-09 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-03-09 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2015-03-09 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-03-06 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-03-06 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2015-02-26 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2015-02-17 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2015-02-17 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2014-11-12 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-11-12 | (C) Draft Request Received |