MT SB355 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise payments related to state school trust lands
Title
Revise payments related to state school trust lands
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Lang [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 81 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Appropriations |
2021-04-20 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-04-15 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2021-04-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2021-04-13 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-04-12 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-04-12 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2021-04-12 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2021-04-12 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2021-04-12 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-06 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2021-04-01 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-03-31 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-03-31 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Taxation |
2021-03-31 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Taxation |
2021-03-26 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2021-03-23 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-03-19 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2021-03-15 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-03-08 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-03-08 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2021-03-02 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-03-01 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-02-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-02-26 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-02-26 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-02-24 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-23 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-02-23 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-02-23 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-02-21 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-21 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-02-20 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-02-19 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-02-17 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-02-17 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-02-16 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-01-29 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-01-29 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-01-16 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-11-19 | (C) Draft Request Received |