MT SB248 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish student-athlete rights and protections
Title
Establish student-athlete rights and protections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-04-30 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2021-04-23 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-23 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-22 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-04-05 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-04-05 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-03-31 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-03-30 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2021-03-30 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-30 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-29 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-23 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Education |
2021-03-19 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Education |
2021-03-17 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Education |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2021-02-27 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-02-27 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-02-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-22 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-02-21 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-02-18 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-02-15 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-02-15 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-15 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-02-12 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-01-26 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-26 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-01-26 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-26 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-01-24 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-01-21 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-01-18 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-11-10 | (C) Draft Request Received |