MT SB168 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise lottery laws relating to sales agent commissions
Title
Revise lottery laws relating to sales agent commissions
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Hertz [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee |
2023-04-07 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-04-07 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2023-04-06 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-04-06 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-06 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-03-21 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Business and Labor |
2023-03-21 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Business and Labor |
2023-03-20 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2023-03-10 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-03-10 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2023-02-10 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2023-02-09 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2023-02-09 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-02-08 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-02-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-02-07 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-02-01 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-02-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-02-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-01-30 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-01-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-01-24 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-01-24 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2023-01-20 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-01-19 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-01-16 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-01-16 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-01-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-13 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-01-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-12 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-01-12 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-01-12 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2023-01-12 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-01-11 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-10 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-01-10 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-10 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-01-09 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-01-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-01-09 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-01-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-01-05 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-01-05 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-01-04 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-09-14 | (C) Draft Request Received |