MT SB165 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise consumer loan act to exempt certain licensees
Title
Revise consumer loan act to exempt certain licensees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-03-27 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2017-03-21 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-20 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-20 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-03-17 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-03-17 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-03-15 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-03-14 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-03-14 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-13 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-03-13 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-10 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Business and Labor |
2017-03-10 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Business and Labor |
2017-03-08 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2017-02-10 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2017-02-08 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2017-02-08 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-03 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-02-03 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-02-03 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-01-27 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-27 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-01-27 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-01-27 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2017-01-26 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-26 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-01-25 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-01-25 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-01-25 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-01-25 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-25 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-25 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-01-25 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-01-25 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-01-24 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-01-21 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-01-17 | (C) Draft Request Received |