MT SB132 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee  
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee  
Summary
Clarify taxpayer confidentiality and exchange of info laws among state agencies
Title
Clarify taxpayer confidentiality and exchange of info laws among state agencies
Sponsors
Sen. Lynda Moss [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | (H) Died in Standing Committee   | |
2009-04-07 | (H) Committee Vote Failed; Remains in Committee (H) Taxation | |
2009-02-16 | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation | |
2009-02-09 | (H) First Reading   | |
2009-02-07 | (S) Transmitted to House   | |
2009-02-07 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed   | |
2009-02-07 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-02-06 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed   | |
2009-02-06 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-01-29 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-01-29 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation | |
2009-01-29 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation | |
2009-01-17 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-01-16 | (S) Fiscal Note Signed   | |
2009-01-15 | (S) Fiscal Note Received   | |
2009-01-15 | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation | |
2009-01-12 | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Taxation | |
2009-01-05 | (S) First Reading   | |
2009-01-02 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation | |
2008-12-23 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested   | |
2008-12-19 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2008-12-19 | (S) Introduced   | |
2008-12-02 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent   | |
2008-12-02 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable   | |
2008-12-02 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2008-12-02 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2008-12-01 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2008-12-01 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2008-12-01 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]   | |
2008-11-26 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2008-11-26 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2008-11-26 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold   | |
2008-11-25 | (C) Draft On Hold   | |
2008-11-07 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2008-07-15 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=132&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find |