MT HB583 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise criminal justice laws
Title
Generally revise criminal justice laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2021-04-08 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for Appropriation Bill Transmittal |
2021-04-06 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2021-03-31 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-03-31 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-03-31 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received |
2021-03-30 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-03-30 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-03-30 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2021-03-29 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2021-03-24 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-03-22 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-03-19 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2021-03-09 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2021-03-02 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2021-03-02 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-03-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Education |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-03-01 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-02-24 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Education |
2021-02-24 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Education |
2021-02-24 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-23 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-02-23 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2021-02-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-02-23 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-02-22 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-02-20 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-02-20 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-20 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-02-18 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-02-18 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-18 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-02-18 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-02-17 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-02-15 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-02-15 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-02-15 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-02-13 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-12-13 | (C) Draft Request Received |