MT HB419 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise laws to create Superfund oversight commmittees
Title
Generally revise laws to create Superfund oversight commmittees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2021-03-02 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2021-02-26 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2021-02-26 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2021-02-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-02-23 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2021-02-22 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-02-22 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Natural Resources |
2021-02-18 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Natural Resources |
2021-02-17 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Natural Resources |
2021-02-16 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2021-02-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-15 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-02-15 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-02-15 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-02-15 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-13 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-02-13 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-02-12 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-02-11 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-02-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-02-10 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-02-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-02-01 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-01-31 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-01-23 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2021-01-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |