MT HB318 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require insurance coverage for children with down syndrome
Title
Require insurance coverage for children with down syndrome
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2015-04-13 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-13 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-13 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-09 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-09 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-08 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-08 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate |
2015-04-08 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-07 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred |
2015-04-07 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-24 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-03-21 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2015-03-21 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-03-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-19 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-19 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2015-03-19 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2015-03-19 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2015-03-16 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2015-03-16 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2015-03-05 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2015-03-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-24 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2015-02-23 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-21 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-19 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-19 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Human Services |
2015-02-18 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Human Services |
2015-02-04 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2015-02-03 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-02 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-02 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-01-26 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-26 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2015-01-26 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-01-26 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-01-21 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-01-12 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-01-09 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-01-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-01-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-09 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-09 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2015-01-09 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-12-31 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-31 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2014-09-23 | (C) Draft Request Received |