MT HB267 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Improve school bus safety laws
Title
Improve school bus safety laws
Sponsors
Rep. Neil Duram [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-05-12 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2021-05-04 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-05-04 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-05-01 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-05-01 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-04-26 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-04-26 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate |
2021-04-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-23 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred |
2021-04-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2021-04-20 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Highways and Transportation |
2021-04-20 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-04-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Highways and Transportation |
2021-04-15 | Senate | (S) Taken from Table in Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2021-04-06 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2021-03-16 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-23 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2021-02-23 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-02-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-22 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-18 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-02-18 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Transportation |
2021-02-17 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Transportation |
2021-02-04 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-02-04 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-02-03 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Transportation |
2021-02-03 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-02-02 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-01-28 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-01-28 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Transportation |
2021-01-27 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-27 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-01-27 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-01-19 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-19 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-01-19 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-19 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-01-18 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-01-18 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-18 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-01-15 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-01-15 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-01-12 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-01-11 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-01-11 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-01-09 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-12-13 | (C) Draft Request Received |