MT HB157 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor
Pending: House Business & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Generally revise alcohol laws for licensing, brewery shared space

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Generally revise alcohol laws for licensing, brewery shared space

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21House(H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor
2021-01-19 (C) Amendments Available
2021-01-15House(H) Sponsor List Modified
2021-01-14House(H) Sponsor List Modified
2021-01-13House(H) First Reading
2021-01-13 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2021-01-13House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor
2021-01-13House(H) Introduced
2021-01-12 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2021-01-12 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2021-01-04 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2021-01-04 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2021-01-04 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2021-01-04 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2020-12-10 (C) Draft in Assembly
2020-12-10 (C) Executive Director Review
2020-12-08 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2020-12-08 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2020-12-07 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2020-11-22 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2020-11-03 (C) Draft in Edit
2020-10-09 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2020-09-11 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback