MT HB14 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bonding program
Title
Bonding program
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Keane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2017-03-27 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2017-03-24 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2017-02-09 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2017-02-09 | House | (H) Scheduled for Executive Action (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning |
2017-01-27 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning |
2017-01-26 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning |
2017-01-25 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning |
2017-01-24 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning |
2017-01-23 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning |
2017-01-20 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning |
2017-01-19 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning |
2017-01-18 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning |
2017-01-17 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning |
2017-01-16 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning |
2017-01-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning |
2017-01-04 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-03 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-01-02 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Appropriations |
2016-12-29 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2016-12-27 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2016-12-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2016-12-09 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-09 | House | (H) Introduced |
2016-12-08 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-12-08 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-12-08 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-12-08 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-08 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-12-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-12-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2016-12-05 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-12-02 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-12-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-12-02 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2016-09-02 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Appropriations
Bond Issues, Public
Debt, Creation of State
Local Finance
Military Affairs
Money Transfer
Revenue, State
Rule Making
State Finance
Utilities
Bond Issues, Public
Debt, Creation of State
Local Finance
Military Affairs
Money Transfer
Revenue, State
Rule Making
State Finance
Utilities
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=14&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20171 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2017/hb0099/HB0014_1.pdf |