MT HB122 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revising state disaster and emergency services and executive power
Title
Revising state disaster and emergency services and executive power
Sponsors
Rep. David Bedey [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-20 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2021-03-02 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2021-02-25 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2021-02-22 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2021-02-04 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2021-01-28 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Pass Consideration |
2021-01-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-01-20 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2021-01-20 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2021-01-12 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2021-01-09 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-01-06 | House | (H) First Reading (H) State Administration |
2021-01-06 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-06 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2021-01-06 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-01-05 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-01-03 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2020-12-31 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2020-12-31 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2020-12-31 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2020-12-31 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2020-12-30 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-30 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-12-23 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-12-22 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2020-12-16 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-12-12 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-12-12 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-12-12 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2020-12-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-12-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-12-02 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2020-11-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-08-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |