MS SR33 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating Jackson State University's Marching Band "sonic Boom Of The South" And Director Dr. Roderick Little For Its Exciting Performance With Rock Legend Usher During The "apple Music Super Bowl Lviii Halftime Show" On The Occasion Of "jsu Day At The Capitol" On March 19, 2024.
Title
Congratulate JSU Marching Band "Sonic Boom of the South" for exciting performance during "Super Bowl LVIII Halftime Show."
Sponsors
Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. David Blount [D] | Sen. Joseph Thomas [D] |
Sen. John Horhn [D] | Sen. Rod Hickman [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. Jeremy England [R] |
Sen. Dean Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Referred To Rules |