MS SC706 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Designating Thursday, May 6, 2010, As The "mississippi Day Of Prayer" To Call On People Of Different Faiths In The State Of Mississippi To Pray For The State And The Nation.
Title
Designate Thursday, May 6, 2010, as the "Mississippi Day of Prayer."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-23 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-05-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-23 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-04-23 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-23 | Adopted | |
2010-04-22 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-04-21 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-04-21 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-21 | Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Referred To Rules |