MS SC626 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Congratulating Dr. Carolyn W. Meyers As President Of Jackson State University On The Occasion Of Her Investiture As The 10th President Of Jsu On March 30, 2012.
Title
Recognize Dr. Carolyn W. Meyers as 10th President of Jackson State University.
Sponsors
Sen. David Blount [D] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] |
Sen. John Horhn [D] | Sen. Perry Lee [R] | Sen. Bill Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-03-21 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-03-20 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-20 | Immediate Release | |
2012-03-20 | Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-03-16 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-03-16 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-16 | Immediate Release | |
2012-03-16 | Adopted | |
2012-03-15 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-03-15 | Referred To Rules |