MS SC607 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Lewisburg High School "patriots" Boys Soccer Team And Head Coach Harl Roehm For Winning Their First-ever Class 5a State Championship.
Title
Congratulate Lewisburg High School "Patriots" Boys Soccer Team for winning its first-ever Class 5A State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-12 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-12 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-12 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-12 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Rules |