MS SC603 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Forest Hill High School "lady Patriots" Girls Basketball Team And Head Coach Tangela Banks For Winning The Mhsaa Class 6a State Championship, Their First State Title In 46 Years.
Title
Commend Forest Hill High School "Lady Patriots" Girls Basketball Team for winning Class 6A State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-03-21 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-03-20 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-20 | Immediate Release | |
2012-03-20 | Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-03-16 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-03-16 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-16 | Immediate Release | |
2012-03-16 | Adopted | |
2012-03-15 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-03-08 | Referred To Rules |